Global Patent Index - EP 1094968 A1

EP 1094968 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING BLISTER PACKS FROM A CUTTING STATION TO A BLISTER PACKS CONVEYING LINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING BLISTER PACKS FROM A CUTTING STATION TO A BLISTER PACKS CONVEYING LINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERGABE VON BLISTER-VERPACKUNGEN VON EINER SCHNEIDESTATION ZU EINER FÖRDERLINIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE PLAQUETTES ALVEOLAIRES D'UN POSTE DE DECOUPE A UNE LIGNE TRANSPORTEUSE DE PLAQUETTES ALVEOLAIRES

Publication

EP 1094968 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00920971 A

Priority

  • IB 0000573 W
  • IT BO990224 A
  • IT BO990407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0068086A1] A device carries out a method according to which two blister packs (2) are picked up at a cutting station (3) and transferred to a conveying line (4) by means of transfer arms (11, 12) having different lengths and equipped with suction cups (13, 14). The transfer arms (11, 12) are supported by a pair of parallel rotating shafts (15, 16) having rotation axes (15b, 16b) crosswise to the advancement direction (Z) of said conveying line (4). The conveying line (4) includes two side by side conveyors (41, 42) and a third conveyor (43) situated downstream. A pair of blister packs (2) are picked up at the cutting station (3) and transferred, offset, to the side by side conveyors (41, 42) and then moved alternately to said third conveyor (43) by a pair of pushers (61, 62).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 35/54; B65G 47/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068086A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0068086 A1 20001116; DE 60015046 D1 20041125; DE 60015046 T2 20060209; EP 1094968 A1 20010502; EP 1094968 B1 20041020

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-12-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-05-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050504

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60015046 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT