Global Patent Index - EP 1094969 A1

EP 1094969 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD FOR THE STERILE PACKAGING OF PRODUCTS, NOTABLY FOOD OR BEVERAGES, IN POUCHES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE STERILE PACKAGING OF PRODUCTS, NOTABLY FOOD OR BEVERAGES, IN POUCHES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM KEIMFREIEN VERPACKEN VON PRODUKTEN, INSBESONDERE NAHRUNGSMITTELN ODER GETRÄNKEN, IN VERPACKUNGSBEUTELN SOWIE DIESBEZÜGLICHER VERPACKUNGSBEUTEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE STERILE DE PRODUITS, EN PARTICULIER DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES OU DE BOISSONS DANS DES SACHETS D'EMBALLAGE, ET SACHETS D'EMBALLAGE Y RELATIFS

Publication

EP 1094969 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924877 A

Priority

EP 9903051 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0066436A1] The invention relates to a method for the sterile packaging of food or beverages in a flexible pouch made of a film material and having a fill opening which can be closed by a cap. According to said method a pouch is prepared in which the cap can be moved into a first and a second closing position in relation to the fill opening, it being possible at least in the first position to remove the cap from the fill opening without causing damage; the interior of the empty, substantially flat pouch, with the cap in the first position, is subjected to a sterilizing treatment; the pouch, with the cap in the first position, whose interior has undergone sterilizing treatment is transferred to a filling station; the exterior of the pouch, with the cap in the first position, is subjected to a sterilizing treatment; the cap is removed from the pouch; the pouch is filled with product via the fill opening; the cap is replaced on the filled pouch; and the fill opening is sealed by moving the cap into the second position. The invention also relates to a corresponding flexible pouch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/02; B65B 7/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/04 (2006.01); B65B 7/28 (2006.01); B65B 55/02 (2006.01); B65B 55/06 (2006.01); B65B 55/08 (2006.01); B65B 55/10 (2006.01); B65D 33/36 (2006.01); B65D 41/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/02 (2013.01); B65B 7/2892 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0066436A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0066436 A1 20001109; AT 247582 T 20030915; AU 4138399 A 20001117; DE 59906693 D1 20030925; DK 1094969 T3 20031201; EP 1094969 A1 20010502; EP 1094969 B1 20030820; ES 2205828 T3 20040501; JP 2002543001 A 20021217; US 6629401 B1 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100505

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100504

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100504

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ASTEPO S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ELSAESSER VERPACKUNGEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEORG *MENSHEN G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080504

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080504

2009-02-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-01-12 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-11-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081104

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-11-02 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20060623

2004-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENSEN PACKAGING CONCEPT GMBH

2004-07-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENSEN PACKAGING CONCEPT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205828 T3

2003-12-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404742

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-12-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906693 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2002-12-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE STERILE PACKAGING OF PRODUCTS, NOTABLY FOOD OR BEVERAGES, IN POUCHES

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE