Global Patent Index - EP 1094972 A2

EP 1094972 A2 2001-05-02 - EASY OPEN BAG

Title (en)

EASY OPEN BAG

Title (de)

LEICHT ZU ÖFFNENDER BEUTEL

Title (fr)

SACS A STRUCTURE D'OUVERTURE FACILE

Publication

EP 1094972 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99929519 A

Priority

  • GB 9902049 W
  • GB 9814778 A
  • GB 9814771 A
  • GB 9912972 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2336862A1] A plastic bag (200) includes a mouth which is covered by a closure flap (205 ). The closure flap (205) may be peeled back in order to open the bag, without damaging the wall of the bag in or at which the mouth is formed. The closure flap (205) is preferably attached to the bag (200) by means of a peelable adhesive (215) and preferably includes lines of weakness (216) along which t he closure flap (205) may be torn. Variations of the bag include a base portion which includes a flat area on which the bag may stand stably.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/24 (2006.01); B65D 30/18 (2006.01); B65D 33/18 (2006.01); B65D 33/20 (2006.01); B65D 33/22 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/20 (2013.01); B65D 31/08 (2013.01); B65D 33/18 (2013.01); B65D 33/22 (2013.01); B65D 75/58 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002782A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2339187 A 20000119; GB 2339187 B 20010815; GB 9915979 D0 19990908; AT 363433 T 20070615; AU 4631199 A 20000201; AU 760569 B2 20030515; BR 9911906 A 20010327; CA 2336862 A1 20000120; CN 1107623 C 20030507; CN 1316964 A 20011010; CZ 20004856 A3 20020116; DE 69936205 D1 20070712; DE 69936205 T2 20080207; EP 1094972 A2 20010502; EP 1094972 B1 20070530; ES 2288316 T3 20080101; HU 0102916 A2 20011228; HU 0102916 A3 20020128; JP 2002520227 A 20020709; NO 20010074 A 20010301; NO 20010074 D0 20010105; NZ 509738 A 20030228; PL 196513 B1 20080131; PL 345846 A1 20020114; TR 200100034 T2 20010521; WO 0002782 A2 20000120; WO 0002782 A3 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171002

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070708

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2288316 T3

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070830

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69936205 P 20070712

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-05-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE