Global Patent Index - EP 1094974 A1

EP 1094974 A1 2001-05-02 - SLOTTED CLOSING VALVE FOR OPENINGS OF CONTAINERS

Title (en)

SLOTTED CLOSING VALVE FOR OPENINGS OF CONTAINERS

Title (de)

SCHLITZSCHLIESSVENTIL FÜR BEHÄLTERÖFFNUNGEN

Title (fr)

CLAPET DE FERMETURE A FENTE POUR OUVERTURES DE RECIPIENTS

Publication

EP 1094974 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00931094 A

Priority

  • DE 29907933 U
  • EP 0003909 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2336552A1] The invention relates to a slotted closing valve for openings of containers or the like comprising a membrane part (2) which is made of a flexible material and which contains at least one unidirectionally aligned slotted outlet opening (5). The inventive slotted closing valve also comprises a base part (1) which surrounds the membrane part on the outer periphery thereof and whi ch is connected to said membrane part. The outlet opening is held in a closing position due to the elastic property of the material. However, it can be moved, under a defined differential overpressure which acts upon one side of the membrane part, against the pretensioning force of the elastic material into an opening position. A peripheral wall area (6) of the base part and an adjacent wall area (3) of the membrane part form an acute angle .alpha. together. In the membrane wall area, at least one additional slotted continuous opening (8) is provided in the vicinity of the base part. Said additional slotted continuous opening is aligned in an essentially periphera l manner, is held in a closing position due to the elastic property of the material, and can be moved into a releasing position under a differential lo w pressure exerted on the membrane part by the side that can be subjected to t he action of the defined differential overpressure. As a result, the valve enables an equalization of pressure between the inner and the outer surroundings of a container, thus having a favorable effect on the restoring ability of the container after the container wall has been compressed by han d in order to empty the contents of the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/50 (2006.01); B65D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/2031 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0066447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29907933 U1 19990812; AT 232491 T 20030215; AU 4915100 A 20001117; CA 2336552 A1 20001109; CN 1129542 C 20031203; CN 1302272 A 20010704; EP 1094974 A1 20010502; EP 1094974 B1 20030212; ES 2189757 T3 20030716; JP 2002543005 A 20021217; US 6450375 B1 20020917; WO 0066447 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEORG MENSHEN G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189757 T3

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-05-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001233 P 20030320

2003-02-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI