Global Patent Index - EP 1095026 A1

EP 1095026 A1 2001-05-02 - PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL AGENTS

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE MITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES

Publication

EP 1095026 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930932 A

Priority

  • AU 9900558 W
  • AU PP458098 A
  • AU PP070099 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/49; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/53; C07D 239/50; C07D 251/48; C07D 251/70; C07D 405/06; C07D 405/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 239/49 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/53 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07D 239/48 (2006.01); C07D 239/50 (2006.01); C07D 251/48 (2006.01); C07D 251/70 (2006.01); C07D 405/06 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095026 A1 20010502; EP 1095026 A4 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070110

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 239/49 20060101AFI20060718BHEP

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 239/50 20060101ALI20060718BHEP

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 405/06 20060101ALI20060718BHEP

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 405/12 20060101ALI20060718BHEP

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/505 20060101ALI20060718BHEP

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 239/48 20060101ALI20060718BHEP

2006-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 25/28 20060101ALI20060718BHEP

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050202

2001-10-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 239/49 A, 7C 07D 239/50 B, 7C 07D 251/70 B, 7C 07D 251/48 B, 7C 07D 405/06 B, 7C 07D 405/12 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B, 7A 61K 31/53 B, 7C 07D 239/48 B, 7A 61P 25/28 B

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI