Global Patent Index - EP 1095050 A1

EP 1095050 A1 2001-05-02 - PHOSPHOROUS ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE

Title (en)

PHOSPHOROUS ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE

Title (de)

PHOSPHORORGANISCHE VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ORGANIQUES DE PHOSPHORE ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1095050 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936505 A

Priority

  • DE 19831639 A
  • DE 19843360 A
  • EP 9904827 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004031A1] The invention relates to phosphorous organic compounds of general formula (I), wherein B is an ether group of formula (II) or a keto group of formula (III) or a pentagonal or hexagonal cyclic compound. The invention also relates to the use of these compounds for producing drugs for treatment or prevention of human or animal infections due to viruses, bacteria, fungi or parasites, as well as their use as fungicide, bactericide and herbicide in plants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 9/38; A01N 57/18; A61K 31/66; C07F 9/572; C07F 9/59; C07F 9/655

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A01N 57/18 (2006.01); A61K 31/10 (2006.01); A61K 31/122 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/155 (2006.01); A61K 31/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/17 (2006.01); A61K 31/366 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4706 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/4985 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/635 (2006.01); A61K 31/65 (2006.01); A61K 31/662 (2006.01); A61K 31/665 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 33/00 (2006.01); C07F 9/38 (2006.01); C07F 9/40 (2006.01); C07F 9/572 (2006.01); C07F 9/59 (2006.01); C07F 9/655 (2006.01); C07K 14/445 (2006.01); C12N 15/52 (2006.01); C12Q 1/527 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 9/6552 (2013.01); A01N 57/18 (2013.01); C07F 9/3808 (2013.01); C07F 9/383 (2013.01); C07F 9/3891 (2013.01); C07F 9/5726 (2013.01); C07F 9/597 (2013.01); C07F 9/65515 (2013.01); C07K 14/445 (2013.01); C12N 15/52 (2013.01); C12Q 1/527 (2013.01); G01N 33/6893 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004031A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004031 A1 20000127; AP 200102051 A0 20010331; AU 5158099 A 20000207; AU 754165 B2 20021107; BR 9912062 A 20010403; CA 2336143 A1 20000127; CN 1309659 A 20010822; EA 200100143 A1 20010625; EE 200100027 A 20020617; EP 1095050 A1 20010502; HR P20010035 A2 20011231; HU 0103481 A2 20020629; HU 0103481 A3 20030128; ID 27347 A 20010405; IL 140433 D0 20020210; IS 5784 A 20001221; JP 2002520419 A 20020709; NO 20010200 A 20010314; NO 20010200 D0 20010112; PL 345864 A1 20020114; SK 662001 A3 20011008; TR 200100068 T2 20010621; US 2003045746 A1 20030306; US 2005075511 A1 20050407; US 6812224 B2 20041102; YU 2201 A 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038362

2005-10-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050412

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOMAA,HASSAN

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOAGENCY AG

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HASSAN, JOMAA

2002-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PHOSPHORUS ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010202;LV PAYMENT 20010202;MK PAYMENT 20010202;SI PAYMENT 20010202