Global Patent Index - EP 1095080 A1

EP 1095080 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING THERMOTROPIC CASTING RESIN SYSTEMS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING THERMOTROPIC CASTING RESIN SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG THERMOTROPER GIESSHARZSYSTEME

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES SYSTEMES DE RESINES A COULER THERMOTROPES

Publication

EP 1095080 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924875 A

Priority

  • DE 19825984 A
  • EP 9903043 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964488A1] The invention relates to a method for producing thermotropic casting resin systems that comprise at least one matrix polymer including at least one thermotropic monomer compound which cannot be mixed with the matrix polymer, whereby the matrix polymer and the thermotropic monomer compound are selected in such a way that their refraction indices are almost the same in a temperature range that is below the temperature required for structural change and that reaches the temperature of structural change of the thermotropic monomer compound, the casting resin system being translucent or transparent in this temperature range. After dissolving the monomer thermotropic compound in a matrix solution containing a photohardening oligomer, reactive diluents and photoinitiators and a liquid, photohardenable system is obtained, photoradiation with exclusion of oxygen is carried out for hardening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 290/14; C03C 17/32; C08F 2/44; C08K 5/01; C09D 4/06; C09D 167/07; C09D 175/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03C 17/32 (2006.01); C08F 2/44 (2006.01); C08F 2/48 (2006.01); C08F 2/50 (2006.01); C08F 290/14 (2006.01); C08K 5/01 (2006.01); C09D 167/07 (2006.01); C09D 175/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 175/16 (2013.01); C03C 17/32 (2013.01); C08F 290/14 (2013.01); C08K 5/01 (2013.01); C09D 167/07 (2013.01); Y10T 428/10 (2013.01); Y10T 428/105 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1077 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1082 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 5/01 + C08L 67/07
  2. C08K 5/01 + C08L 75/16

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964488A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964488 A1 19991216; DE 19825984 C1 20000316; EP 1095080 A1 20010502; US 6489377 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-04-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING THERMOTROPIC CASTING RESIN SYSTEMS

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL