Global Patent Index - EP 1095119 A1

EP 1095119 A1 2001-05-02 - LEVELLER BAR FOR COKING OVENS

Title (en)

LEVELLER BAR FOR COKING OVENS

Title (de)

PLANIERSTANGE FÜR VERKOKUNGSÖFEN

Title (fr)

BARRE DE NIVELLEMENT DESTINEE AUX FOURS DE COKEFACTION

Publication

EP 1095119 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932784 A

Priority

  • DE 19830382 A
  • EP 9904578 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830382A1] The invention relates to a levelling bar for coking ovens, for levelling the cones of discharged coal which form under the filling holes of the oven chamber during the filling process. The levelling bar consists of two cheeks, such as plates (1), which extend essentially over the entire length of the oven chamber and which are arranged at a distance from each other depending on the width of the oven chamber, and parallel to each other. They are also interconnected and are essentially vertical. The levelling bar also has transversal coal carriers (2) which are arranged in the intermediate space delimited by the cheeks (1) at a mutual distance, one behind the other and which only extend over part of the cross-sectional surface of the levelling bar formed between the cheeks (1). The height (3) of the coal carriers (2), which take up the entire interval between the cheeks, is less than the height (H) of the cheeks (1) and the cheeks form a gas channel (6) above the coal carriers (2) which is essentially free of built-in components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 37/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002976A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830382 A1 20000113; DE 19830382 C2 20010315; AT 240996 T 20030615; AU 4904799 A 20000201; AU 755720 B2 20021219; BR 9912520 A 20010502; BR 9912520 B1 20100323; CA 2337006 A1 20000120; CA 2337006 C 20080617; CN 1119387 C 20030827; CN 1313888 A 20010919; CZ 20004919 A3 20010613; CZ 300394 B6 20090506; EP 1095119 A1 20010502; EP 1095119 B1 20030521; ES 2198927 T3 20040201; JP 2002520443 A 20020709; JP 3935318 B2 20070620; KR 100440048 B1 20040714; PL 194035 B1 20070430; PL 345342 A1 20011217; RU 2198908 C2 20030220; SK 286433 B6 20081007; SK 32001 A3 20010806; TW 561188 B 20031111; US 6929719 B1 20050816; WO 0002976 A1 20000120; ZA 200100122 B 20011022

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198927 T3

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1095119E

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905661 P 20030626

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001223

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE