Global Patent Index - EP 1095121 A1

EP 1095121 A1 2001-05-02 - SOLUBILISING COMPOSITON

Title (en)

SOLUBILISING COMPOSITON

Title (de)

SOLUBILISIERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE SOLUBILISATION

Publication

EP 1095121 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915880 A

Priority

  • GB 9901073 W
  • GB 9807792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2336120A] A solubilising composition which allows fuel oil and water, especially diesel oil and water, to be combined as a clear, stable homogenous solution comprises (a) an alcohol ethoxylate having a hydroxyl number greater than 160 and melting point below- 150C; and (b) a complex mixture of higher fatty acid diethanolamides derived from coconut oil, or its synthetic equivalent. The composition may also contain minor proportions of (c) ethylene glycol monobutyl ether or monobutyl ester or (d) an alcohol containing 5 or more carbon atoms. Fuel extenders such as ethanol may also be included in the compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/10; B01F 3/08; B01F 17/00; B01F 17/22; B01F 17/42; C10L 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/10 (2006.01); C10L 1/32 (2006.01); C10L 1/12 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 10/02 (2013.01); C10L 1/10 (2013.01); C10L 1/328 (2013.01); C10L 1/125 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1852 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/224 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952994A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2336120 A 19991013; GB 9807792 D0 19980610; AU 3430599 A 19991101; EP 1095121 A1 20010502; WO 9952994 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20011002

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COVAL TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

2004-10-20 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020119

2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011002

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COVAL TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE