Global Patent Index - EP 1095133 A4

EP 1095133 A4 2003-06-11 - FTSZ MULTIMERIC PROTEINS AND THEIR USES

Title (en)

FTSZ MULTIMERIC PROTEINS AND THEIR USES

Title (de)

MULTIMERE FTSZ PROTEINE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROTEINES MULTIMERES DE FTSZ ET LEURS APPLICATIONS

Publication

EP 1095133 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99935377 A

Priority

  • US 9914890 W
  • US 9168098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001801A1] The invention provides multimeric FtsZ polypeptides and polynucleotides encoding multimeric FtsZ polypeptides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques. Also provided are methods for utilizing multimeric FtsZ polypeptides to screen for antibacterial compounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/00; C07K 14/31; C07K 14/315; C12N 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/31 (2006.01); C07K 14/315 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/3156 (2013.01); C07K 14/31 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9818930 A2 19980507 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [PX] EP 0899334 A2 19990303 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] XP002213999, retrieved from EBI Database accession no. UO6462
  • [X] YU ET AL: "Inhibition of assembly of bacterial cell division protein FtsZ by the hydrophobic dye 5,5'-bis-(8-anilino-1-naphthalenesulfonate)", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 273, no. 17, 24 April 1998 (1998-04-24), pages 10216 - 10222, XP002134449, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [A] MUKHERJEE A ET AL: "DYNAMIC ASSEMBLY OF FTSZ REGULATED BY GTP HYDROLYSIS", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, vol. 17, no. 2, 1998, pages 462 - 464, XP000882877, ISSN: 0261-4189
  • [A] MUKHERJEE AMIT ET AL: "Inhibition of FtsZ polymerization by SulA, an inhibitor of septation in Escherichia coli.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, vol. 95, no. 6, 17 March 1998 (1998-03-17), March 17, 1998, pages 2885 - 2890, XP002234120, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • See also references of WO 0001801A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001801 A1 20000113; WO 0001801 A9 20000525; EP 1095133 A1 20010502; EP 1095133 A4 20030611; JP 2002519055 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 9/00 A, 7C 12N 9/16 B, 7C 07K 14/31 B, 7C 07K 14/315 B

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE