Global Patent Index - EP 1095134 A1

EP 1095134 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD TO PREPARE C-TERMINAL MODIFIED PEPTIDES

Title (en)

METHOD TO PREPARE C-TERMINAL MODIFIED PEPTIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON C-TERMINAL MODIFIZIERTEN PEPTIDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PEPTIDES MODIFIES A TERMINAL C

Publication

EP 1095134 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99955499 A

Priority

  • GB 9901855 W
  • GB 9812675 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964574A1] Non-peptide molecules of formula (I) may be used to mimic the structure of peptides and to bind with proteins which naturally bind peptide ligands. In said formula, C' is a substituted or unsubstituted carbon atom; X is a C1 to C4 chain in which each of the carbon atoms may be substituted or unsubstituted; and R<1> and R<2> are groups mimicking the side chains of a natural or unnatural amino acid. The molecules may either be used on their own, or may be incorporated into larger molecules such as polypeptides. In either case, they may be used as therapeutics to alter the activity of the protein. Additionally, they may be used to assay the proteins or to act as affinity ligands in their purification. Methods of manufacturing polypeptides incorporating the molecules of the invention are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/90; A61K 47/48; C07K 1/04; C07K 1/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C07K 1/107 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/1077 (2013.01); A61K 47/62 (2017.08); C07K 1/04 (2013.01); C12N 9/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964574A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964574 A1 19991216; AU 4282599 A 19991230; EP 1095134 A1 20010502; GB 9812675 D0 19980812; JP 2002517233 A 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2005-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYCLACEL LIMITED

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040512

2001-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CYCLACEL LIMITED

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE