Global Patent Index - EP 1095181 A1

EP 1095181 A1 2001-05-02 - FLUID SUPPLY DEVICE FOR AN IRON

Title (en)

FLUID SUPPLY DEVICE FOR AN IRON

Title (de)

FLUIDFÖRDEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BÜGELEISEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT DE FLUIDE POUR FER A REPASSER

Publication

EP 1095181 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932818 A

Priority

  • DE 19829675 A
  • EP 9904661 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829675A1] The invention relates to a fluid supply device for an iron, comprising a housing in which a pump chamber is positioned, a pump element for modifying the pump chamber volume and an actuating part for actuating the pump element. The fluid supply device is characterized in that the actuating part is configured as a deformable membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/14 (2006.01); D06F 75/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/22 (2013.01); D06F 75/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829675 A1 20000113; EP 1095181 A1 20010502; EP 1095181 B1 20050302; ES 2239449 T3 20050916; US 6249996 B1 20010626; WO 0001873 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-25 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DE LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH

- Effective date: 20150921

2014-08-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DE'LONGHI BRAUN HOUSEHOLD GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRAUN GMBH, 61476 KRONBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59911705

- Effective date: 20140701

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239449 T3

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-07-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050620

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911705 P 20050407

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL