Global Patent Index - EP 1095195 A1

EP 1095195 A1 2001-05-02 - BUILDING STONE

Title (en)

BUILDING STONE

Title (de)

BAUSTEIN

Title (fr)

PIERRE A BATIR

Publication

EP 1095195 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99930913 A

Priority

  • AT 9900175 W
  • AT 118198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003103A1] The invention relates to a building stone for masonry work, comprising lateral joining surfaces (3, 4) and an upper and lower bearing surface (1, 2). At least one notch (5), which is situated at a distance from the horizontal boundary edges of the upper and lower bearing surfaces (1, 2) and extends over only part of the height (h) of the building stone, is cut into each of the lateral joining surfaces (3, 4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0213 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003103A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003103 A1 20000120; AT 215647 T 20020415; AT 406879 B 20001025; AT A118198 A 20000215; AU 4760899 A 20000201; BG 105105 A 20011031; BG 63881 B1 20030430; DE 59901137 D1 20020508; EP 1095195 A1 20010502; EP 1095195 B1 20020403; ES 2156847 T1 20010801; ES 2156847 T3 20021116; HR P20010011 A2 20011231; HR P20010011 B1 20090228; HU 0102822 A2 20020128; HU 0102822 A3 20020228; HU 223402 B1 20040628; MD 20010094 A 20010731; MD 2104 F2 20030228; MD 2104 G2 20030831; ME 00168 B 20101010; ME P8308 A 20100610; PT 1095195 E 20020930; RS 50127 B 20090325; SI EP1095195 T1 20020831; SK 22001 A3 20011008; SK 286511 B6 20081205; TR 200100026 T2 20010723; YU 901 A 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170710

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KASA, MARTIN, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KASA, MARTIN, AT

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150108

2015-01-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150108

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901137

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120708

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KASA MARTIN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1095195E

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156847 T3

2002-10-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-26 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402051

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2002-07-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-07-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-07-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901137 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010208;MK PAYMENT 20010208;RO PAYMENT 20010208;SI PAYMENT 20010208

2002-04-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215647 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-08-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156847 T1

2001-06-22 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010208;MK PAYMENT 20010208;RO PAYMENT 20010208;SI PAYMENT 20010208