Global Patent Index - EP 1095232 A1

EP 1095232 A1 2001-05-02 - STORAGE COMPARTMENT

Title (en)

STORAGE COMPARTMENT

Title (de)

ABSTELLFACH

Title (fr)

COMPARTIMENT DE RANGEMENT

Publication

EP 1095232 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931256 A

Priority

  • DE 19830325 A
  • EP 9904738 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830325A1] The invention relates to a storage compartment which can be attached to the inner lining (15) of a refrigerator door (13) and comprises a compartment body (22) which defines a storage space. The invention is characterized in that the compartment body (22) is removably assembled from individual elements (24, 30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/04; A47B 96/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/04 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001992A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830325 A1 20000113; BR 9911758 A 20010403; CN 1166911 C 20040915; CN 1307674 A 20010808; EP 1095232 A1 20010502; EP 1095232 B1 20040609; ES 2222714 T3 20050201; TR 200003563 T2 20010621; WO 0001992 A1 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160706

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100707

2011-03-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110222

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222714 T3

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909696 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE