Global Patent Index - EP 1095238 A1

EP 1095238 A1 2001-05-02 - DEVICE FOR ELIMINATING MEANS OF COMBAT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ELIMINATING MEANS OF COMBAT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON KAMPFMITTELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ELIMINER DES MOYENS DE COMBAT

Publication

EP 1095238 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926221 A

Priority

  • EP 99926221 A
  • CH 9900293 W
  • EP 98810630 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0971199A1] An explosive ordnance disposal (EOD) system with improved applications has a hollow charge (4) contained in a non metallic, plastic housing (1) and with the shaping (3) of the hollow charge of amorphous material. The detonator (6) is plugged into the top cover (5) of the housing and the system positioned at the end of a support (16) via a universal joint (12,13,14). This enables the operator to best align the EOD with the ordnance (M) for maximum effect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/08; F42B 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/08 (2006.01); F42B 33/06 (2006.01); F42D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/02 (2013.01); F41H 11/12 (2013.01); F42B 3/08 (2013.01); F42B 33/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002002A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0971199 A1 20000112; AT 226313 T 20021115; AU 4356899 A 20000124; AU 754665 B2 20021121; BG 105050 A 20010928; BG 63954 B1 20030731; BR 9911864 A 20010320; CA 2335741 A1 20000113; CN 1097203 C 20021225; CN 1308721 A 20010815; CZ 20004930 A3 20011114; CZ 291632 B6 20030416; DE 59903103 D1 20021121; DK 1095238 T3 20021230; EA 002556 B1 20020627; EA 200100116 A1 20010827; EE 200100012 A 20020617; EP 1095238 A1 20010502; EP 1095238 B1 20021016; ES 2184458 T3 20030401; HU 0102875 A2 20011128; HU 0102875 A3 20020429; IL 140617 A 20040219; IL 140617 D0 20020210; JP 2002519623 A 20020702; NO 20010063 A 20010301; NO 20010063 D0 20010105; NZ 509189 A 20030131; PL 345449 A1 20011217; PT 1095238 E 20030228; SI 1095238 T1 20030228; TR 200100001 T2 20010521; US 6453788 B1 20020924; WO 0002002 A1 20000113; YU 501 A 20030430; ZA 200100986 B 20020506

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RUAG MUNITION

- Effective date: 20040731

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAAB BOFORS DYNAMICS SWITZERLAND LTD.

- Free text: RUAG MUNITION#ALLMENDSTRASSE 74#3602 THUN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SAAB BOFORS DYNAMICS SWITZERLAND LTD.#ALLMENDSTRASSE 86#3602 THUN (CH)

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-07-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060702

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040703

2005-07-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050715

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040702

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RUAG MUNITION

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-08-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-07-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-02-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030702

2004-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-08-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030804

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-21 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030721

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-17 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-06-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184458 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404446

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903103 20021121

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010122;LT PAYMENT 20010122;MK PAYMENT 20010122;RO PAYMENT 20010122;SI PAYMENT 20010122

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226313 T 20021115

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUAG MUNITION

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011204

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010122;LT PAYMENT 20010122;LV;MK PAYMENT 20010122;RO PAYMENT 20010122;SI PAYMENT 20010122