Global Patent Index - EP 1095297 A1

EP 1095297 A1 2001-05-02 - POLARISATION BEAM SPLITTER

Title (en)

POLARISATION BEAM SPLITTER

Title (de)

POLARISATIONSSTRAHLENTEILER

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR DE POLARISATIONS

Publication

EP 1095297 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00925417 A

Priority

  • FR 0001242 W
  • FR 9906003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0068716A1] The invention concerns a polarisation beam splitter comprising a splitting medium included between two transparent elements with specific indices. The splitting medium comprises a periodic structure of layers of materials with different indices of slight pitch when facing the wavelength of an incident beam, so as to form a uniaxial birefringent medium with an optical axis perpendicular to the plane of the periodic structure. The two transparent elements are made of material with index substantially equal to the ordinary index (no) of the periodic structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 5/30; G02B 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 27/283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0068716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2793566 A1 20001117; FR 2793566 B1 20020712; EP 1095297 A1 20010502; US 6384974 B1 20020507; WO 0068716 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20081010

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060713

2007-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: REMOTE ACCESS, LLC

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060713

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE