Global Patent Index - EP 1095315 A1

EP 1095315 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING MICROLITHOGRAPHY PROJECTION LIGHTING DEVICES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING MICROLITHOGRAPHY PROJECTION LIGHTING DEVICES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DEKONTAMINATION VON MIKROLITHOGRAPHIE-PROJEKTIONSBELICHTUNGSANLAGEN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT DE DECONTAMINER LES DISPOSITIFS D'ECLAIRAGE PAR PROJECTION UTILISES EN MICROLITHOGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 1095315 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929261 A

Priority

  • DE 19830438 A
  • EP 9904210 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830438A1] The invention relates to a method for decontaminating microlithography projection lighting devices with optical elements (2) or parts thereof, especially the surfaces of optical elements, wherein a UV-light and a fluid are used. A second UV-light source (5) is directed towards at least one part of the optical element (2) during exposure pauses for decontamination.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 7/20; B08B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/70883 (2013.01); B08B 7/0057 (2013.01); G03F 7/7005 (2013.01); G03F 7/70925 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003304A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830438 A1 20000113; EP 1095315 A1 20010502; JP 2002520839 A 20020709; TW 425494 B 20010311; US 2001026402 A1 20011004; US 6936825 B2 20050830; WO 0003304 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100105

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS CARL ZEISS

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL