Global Patent Index - EP 1095323 A1

EP 1095323 A1 2001-05-02 - THERMOSTATIC MIXING VALVE WITH SEQUENTIAL MANUAL CONTROL

Title (en)

THERMOSTATIC MIXING VALVE WITH SEQUENTIAL MANUAL CONTROL

Title (de)

THEMOSTATISCHES MISCHVENTIL MIT SEQUENTIELLER HANDBEDIENUNG

Title (fr)

MELANGEUR THERMOSTATIQUE AVEC COMMANDE SEQUENTIELLE MANUELLE

Publication

EP 1095323 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922922 A

Priority

  • IT TO980393 A
  • US 9910280 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959045A1] A thermostatic mixing valve (10), includes two inlet ports (20, 22) for cold water and for hot water, a mixing chamber (59), passages (30, 31) between the inlet ports and the mixing chamber, an outlet passage (33) and port (34) from the mixing chamber for the mixed water, a thermostatic element (64) arranged at least partly in the mixing chamber and a distribution slide valve (44) controlled by the thermostatic element. The two inlet passages and the outlet passage are made in a central body (28) arranged inside the distribution slide valve in which the distribution slide valve is arranged so as to modify the passages between only one of the inlet passages and the mixing chamber. A sequential manual control valve (80) is inserted so as to control the two inlet passages. The sequential manual valve comprises a fixed plate (82) and a rotatable plate (84) mounted in such a way that it can be rotated on the fixed plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 23/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05D 23/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05D 23/1353 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959045 A1 19991118; AU 3981199 A 19991129; BR 9909707 A 20001226; CA 2321520 A1 19991118; CA 2321520 C 20050614; EP 1095323 A1 20010502; EP 1095323 A4 20010808; IT TO980393 A1 19991112; JP 2003524807 A 20030819; TW 409167 B 20001021

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KNAPP, FRANCESCO

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-08-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI GB IT