Global Patent Index - EP 1095345 A1

EP 1095345 A1 2001-05-02 - THIRD PARTY PRIVACY SYSTEM

Title (en)

THIRD PARTY PRIVACY SYSTEM

Title (de)

SYSTEM WELCHES VERTRAULICHKEIT VERSICHERT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ASSURANT LA CONFIDENTIALITE DE TIERS

Publication

EP 1095345 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930386 A

Priority

  • US 9913752 W
  • US 10067198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966428A1] A system and method of providing privacy through anonymity is described. As one aspect of the invention, a person registers at a privacy server (100) and is given a pseudo identity that can be used to browse, register, purchase, pay for, and take delivery of products and services. Transactions are completed with the privacy server (100) on a need-to-know basis. A seller (110) communicates with the privacy server (100) but only sees a demand, not the identity of the buyer (120). The financial institution (140) communicates with the privacy server (100) and sees the payment, not the merchandise. The freight company (150) communicates with the privacy server (100) and sees the package, not its contents. The privacy server (100) operates in a manner that assures privacy and anonymity for the buyer and, if necessary, both the seller as well.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966428 A1 19991223; AU 4693799 A 20000105; CA 2335689 A1 19991223; EA 200100081 A1 20010625; EP 1095345 A1 20010502; EP 1095345 A4 20030402

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050715

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRIVACY INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.

2003-04-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 9/32 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 1/00 B

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001221;LT PAYMENT 20001221;LV PAYMENT 20001221;MK PAYMENT 20001221;RO PAYMENT 20001221;SI PAYMENT 20001221