Global Patent Index - EP 1095389 A1

EP 1095389 A1 2001-05-02 - CURRENT CONTACT SYSTEM FOR A CURRENT SWITCH

Title (en)

CURRENT CONTACT SYSTEM FOR A CURRENT SWITCH

Title (de)

STROMKONTAKTANORDNUNGEN EINES STROMSCHALTERS

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLES CONTACTS D'UN COMMUTATEUR DE COURANT

Publication

EP 1095389 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926225 A

Priority

  • CH 9900301 W
  • DE 19830232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830232A1] According to the invention, a mobile first current contact system (K1) at its end has a switching contact (P4) and a U-shaped arcing horn (R1). A fixed second current contact system (K2) at its end has a switching contact (P1) and a U-shaped current conductor loop (R2). Said current conductor loop (R2) in its U-shaped part consists of a bimetallic strip made of steel (2) on the inside and copper (3) on the outside; contiguous thereto the invention provides for two opposite switching contacts (P2, P3) and, at the end side, an arcing horn (3'). When the current switch is closed the first current contact system (K1) is shifted to the left against the direction of an arrow (5) so that all four switching contacts (P1-P4) are situated on top of each other in pressure contact. When the current switch is opened the contact pairs (P1, P2) are separated, so that a current (4) is switched from them into the current conductor loop (R2) (see hatched line in the figure). After normalization of the current conductor loop (R2) the contact pair (P3, P4) is also separated so that an electric arc (6) is created which by the asymmetric current conduction in the current conductor loop (R2) is driven onto the arcing horns (3', R1). In this way the electric arc is rapidly driven away from its original point of contact and increasingly exposed to a magnetic field in an asymmetric manner so that its operating voltage rises rapidly. This contact system is easy and economical to produce and ensures reduced contact erosion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/44 (2006.01); H01H 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/44 (2013.01); H01H 1/385 (2013.01); H01H 9/446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0003406A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830232 A1 20000113; CN 1146930 C 20040421; CN 1307726 A 20010808; EP 1095389 A1 20010502; EP 1095389 B1 20020306; US 6320149 B1 20011120; WO 0003406 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070706

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060706

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060707

2006-07-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060706

2005-07-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (CH-LC/IP)

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900953 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001216

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE