Global Patent Index - EP 1095396 A2

EP 1095396 A2 2001-05-02 - MUFFIN TIN STYLE CATHODE ELEMENT FOR DIODE SPUTTER ION PUMP

Title (en)

MUFFIN TIN STYLE CATHODE ELEMENT FOR DIODE SPUTTER ION PUMP

Title (de)

MUFFINFORMARTIGE KATHODENELEMENT FÜR EINE DIODENZERSTAÜBUNGSPUMPE

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CATHODE EN FORME DE MOULE A MUFFINS POUR POMPE IONIQUE DIODE

Publication

EP 1095396 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00918829 A

Priority

  • EP 0002546 W
  • US 12531899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057451A2] Diode sputter ion pumps display instabilities like current bursts, leakage currents and arcs typically following pumping exposure to gas doses greater than the ultimate pressure of the vacuum system in which the pump is operating. The instabilities are disruptive to the devices to which the sputter ion pump is attached. The invention provides an ion pump that exhibits improved stability and reduced leakage current. The instabilities are caused by explosive arc emission and electron emission from structures like dendritic protrusions that grow on the cathode plate, whose shape and placement give rise to high electric fields. According to the invention the cathode includes a sputterable material for removing gases from the environment of the ion pump and shaped so that during operation of the ion pump the electric field in a dendritic growth region is insufficient to cause field emission from the dendrites thereby reducing instabilities in the operation of the ion pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 41/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 41/12 (2006.01); H01J 41/18 (2006.01); H01J 41/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 41/18 (2013.01); H01J 41/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057451A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057451 A2 20000928; WO 0057451 A3 20010208; EP 1095396 A2 20010502; JP 2002540563 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070202

2006-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060606

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE