Global Patent Index - EP 1095421 A1

EP 1095421 A1 2001-05-02 - FEEDING OR DECOUPLING DEVICE FOR A COAXIAL LINE, ESPECIALLY FOR A MULTIPLE COAXIAL LINE

Title (en)

FEEDING OR DECOUPLING DEVICE FOR A COAXIAL LINE, ESPECIALLY FOR A MULTIPLE COAXIAL LINE

Title (de)

SPEISE- ODER AUSKOPPELVORRICHTUNG FÜR KOAXIALLEITUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR MEHRFACH- KOAXIALLEITUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION OU DE DECOUPLAGE POUR LIGNE COAXIALE, NOTAMMENT POUR LIGNE COAXIALE MULTIPLE

Publication

EP 1095421 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00931081 A

Priority

  • DE 19920980 A
  • EP 0003839 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0069015A1] A feeding or decoupling device for coaxial lines has a spur line (SL) which is short-circuited at the end. The aim of the invention is to provide at least one simple coaxial line with a broadband connection between the inner and outer conductor or to provide at least one simple coaxial line with a corresponding, at least narrow band, preferably also broadband, short circuit connection between the inner and outer conductor. To this end, at least two interwoven coaxial spur lines (SL1, SL2) are provided preferably, said spur lines each being short-circuited at the end with a short circuit (KS1, KS2) and the length of the spur lines being measured in such a way that the appropriate short circuit (KS1, KS2) is transformed to no-load at the feeding and connecting point (46) according to the frequency band range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/12; H01P 3/06; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02G 1/14 (2006.01); H01P 1/213 (2006.01); H01P 5/02 (2006.01); H01P 5/16 (2006.01); H01Q 1/50 (2006.01); H01Q 5/25 (2015.01); H01Q 5/371 (2015.01); H01Q 5/48 (2015.01); H01Q 9/18 (2006.01); H01Q 9/28 (2006.01); H01Q 11/14 (2006.01); H01Q 13/28 (2006.01); H01Q 21/30 (2006.01); H02G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/16 (2013.01); H01Q 5/25 (2013.01); H01Q 5/371 (2013.01); H01Q 5/48 (2013.01); H01Q 9/28 (2013.01); H01Q 9/285 (2013.01); H01Q 21/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0069015 A1 20001116; AT 380403 T 20071215; AU 4914100 A 20001121; AU 762518 B2 20030626; BR 0006103 A 20010403; CA 2336579 A1 20001116; CA 2336579 C 20080708; CN 1199312 C 20050427; CN 1302462 A 20010704; DE 19920980 A1 20001207; DE 19920980 C2 20020207; DE 50014826 D1 20080117; EP 1095421 A1 20010502; EP 1095421 B1 20071205; ES 2295029 T3 20080416; HK 1037935 A1 20050930; JP 2002544691 A 20021224; NZ 508737 A 20030429; US 6509815 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160428

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160427

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130427

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130427

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080427

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080427

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080306

2008-11-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080908

2008-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KATHREIN-WERKE K.G.

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080505

2008-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2295029 T3

2008-03-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2008-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014826 P 20080117

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-12-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061103

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI