Global Patent Index - EP 1095438 A1

EP 1095438 A1 2001-05-02 - DEVICE FOR DISTRIBUTING ENERGY BETWEEN A PLURALITY OF ELECTRONIC MODULES WITH POSSIBILITY OF SHEDDING

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DISTRIBUTING ENERGY BETWEEN A PLURALITY OF ELECTRONIC MODULES WITH POSSIBILITY OF SHEDDING

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMVERTEILUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE ZWISCHEN EINER VIELZAHL ELEKTRONISCHER MODULE MIT ABSCHALTUNGSMÖGLICHKEIT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REPARTITION D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE ENTRE UNE PLURALITE DE MODULES ELECTRONIQUES AVEC POSSIBILITE DE DELESTAGE

Publication

EP 1095438 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00925359 A

Priority

  • FR 0001163 W
  • FR 9905654 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0067357A1] The invention concerns device for safely powering several electronic modules which can be assembled in one common switch cupboard and having several levels of criticality. It comprises a distribution line (13) connected to at least one electric power distributing system (20) and to different electronic modules (M1. M2, to Mn) via switch-relays (l1, l2 to ln) and means for managing shedding generating commands for opening and closing the switch-relays (l1, l2 to ln) on the basis of received shedding control signals. The shedding management means consist of a network distributing shedding commands (21) connected to the switch-relay controls (l1, l2, to lN) via diode switching (S1, S2, to Sn) and a system of straps (22, 200) providing them with high faculty of adaptation to modifications in the configuration of the equipment in the switch cupboard.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02J 1/14; H02J 3/14; H02J 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02J 1/14 (2006.01); H02J 3/14 (2006.01); H02J 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02J 4/00 (2013.01); H02J 1/14 (2013.01); H02J 3/14 (2013.01); Y10T 307/406 (2015.04); Y10T 307/469 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0067357A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2793356 A1 20001110; FR 2793356 B1 20010810; CA 2335934 A1 20001109; EP 1095438 A1 20010502; IL 140577 D0 20020210; US 6472774 B1 20021029; WO 0067357 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091103

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090914

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES AVIONICS S.A.

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE