Global patent index - EP 1095449 A1

EP 1095449 A1 2001-05-02 - AMPLIFIER WITH DYNAMICALLY ADAPTABLE SUPPLY CURRENT

Title (en)

AMPLIFIER WITH DYNAMICALLY ADAPTABLE SUPPLY CURRENT

Title (de)

VERTSÄRKER MIT DYNAMISCH ANPASSBAREM VERSORGUNGSSTROM

Title (fr)

AMPLIFICATEUR AVEC COURANT D'ALIMENTATION A ADAPTATION DYNAMIQUE

Publication

EP 1095449 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99922981 A

Priority

  • US 9910439 W
  • US 8077398 A
  • US 8081198 A
  • US 8081298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960698A1] An adaptable DC power consumption circuit (50) is provided with a feedback control loop (78) formed between the power terminal and the control terminal of the RF amplifier (52). A controller (60) influences the feedback control loop to properly set the supply current at the desired minimum level necessary to maintain linear operation of the RF amplifier. The output of the RF amplifier influences the feedback control loop to dynamically vary the supply current from the desired level. Another feedback control loop is formed between the power terminal and a control terminal of a variable voltage supply. The controller influences the feedback control loop to properly set the supply voltage at the desired minimum level necessary to maintain linear operation of the RF amplifier. The output of the RF amplifier influences the feedback control loop to dynamically vary the supply voltage from the desired level. The controller alternately operates the RF amplifier during a high RF output power condition, and bypasses the RF amplifier during a low RF output power condition. In this manner, linear operation of the RF amplifier can be maintained while maximizing the power efficiency of the RF amplifier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03G 3/30; H03F 1/02; H03G 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03F 1/02 (2006.01); H03G 3/20 (2006.01); H03G 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03F 1/0216 (2013.01); H03F 1/0211 (2013.01); H03F 1/0244 (2013.01); H03F 1/0255 (2013.01); H03F 1/0272 (2013.01); H03F 1/0277 (2013.01); H03G 3/004 (2013.01); H03G 3/3042 (2013.01); H03F 2200/504 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960698 A1 19991125; AU 3985399 A 19991206; EP 1095449 A1 20010502; EP 1095449 A4 20051109

INPADOC legal status

2011-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20101130

2005-11-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050927

2005-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 03G 3/30 A

2005-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 03F 1/02 B

2005-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 03G 3/20 B

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XIRCOM WIRELESS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE