Global Patent Index - EP 1095466 A1

EP 1095466 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE START OF A PULSE IN A SPREAD SPECTRUM SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE START OF A PULSE IN A SPREAD SPECTRUM SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG DES BEGINNS EINES PULSES IN EINEM SPREIZSPEKTRUMSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LE DEBUT D'UNE IMPULSION DANS UN SYSTEME A SPECTRE ETALE

Publication

EP 1095466 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00931164 A

Priority

  • EP 00931164 A
  • EP 0004189 W
  • EP 99401088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0067387A1] This station comprises a system in which information is transmitted in the form of symbols appearing in symbol periods. The station comprises a receiving circuit in which a synchronizing circuit is provided for producing an indication of the start of a symbol. This synchronizing circuit comprises a measuring circuit for measuring the energy of the transmitted signal, a first integration circuit for integrating this energy measurement, a second integration circuit for integrating this energy measurement as a function of the output signal of the first integration circuit. Finally, a threshold circuit produces a start-of-received-symbol signal based on the output signal of the second integration circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/707; H04B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/707 (2011.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/70775 (2013.01); H04B 2201/70702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0067387A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0067387 A1 20001109; CN 1302483 A 20010704; EP 1095466 A1 20010502; JP 2002543734 A 20021217; TW 503630 B 20020921

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLON FRANCE SAS

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE