Global Patent Index - EP 1095473 A2

EP 1095473 A2 2001-05-02 - OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM THAT TRANSMITS AND RECEIVES DATA THROUGH FREE SPACE

Title (en)

OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEM THAT TRANSMITS AND RECEIVES DATA THROUGH FREE SPACE

Title (de)

OPTISCHES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN IN FREIEN RAUM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE QUI TRANSMET ET RE OIT DES DONNEES PAR L'ESPACE LIBRE

Publication

EP 1095473 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99937256 A

Priority

  • US 9915973 W
  • US 9307698 P
  • US 34844099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004660A2] A system and method for networked high-speed data communication through free space is described. The system includes one or more central networks, which contain one or more lasers modulated with high-speed data to illuminate with laser light areas surrounding the central network in which are located one or more user networks. The laser from the central network generates a radiation pattern that is sectored into horizontal and vertical sectors, and further divided into channels for each wavelength. Data coming from the user networks modulates a laser, which is transmitted as a collimated beam through free space back to the central network where it is received. Communication can be point-to-point, point-to-multipoint, multipoint-to-point, or multipoint-to-multipoint, and the point-to-multipoint communication can be broadcast, simulcast, or multicast.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 10/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/112 (2013.01); H04L 12/00 (2006.01); H04Q 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/1125 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0062 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0067 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004660 A2 20000127; WO 0004660 A3 20000504; WO 0004660 A8 20001005; WO 0004660 A9 20010802; AU 5213099 A 20000207; AU 773035 B2 20040513; BR 9912826 A 20010502; CA 2337763 A1 20000127; CN 1318236 A 20011017; EP 1095473 A2 20010502; ID 28657 A 20010621; IL 140896 D0 20020210; JP 2002521856 A 20020716; PL 346368 A1 20020211; TR 200100102 T2 20010521

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033621

2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TERABEAM CORPORATION

2001-06-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TERABEAM CORPORATION

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI