Global Patent Index - EP 1095541 A1

EP 1095541 A1 2001-05-02 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR ENERGY-SAVING OPERATION OF A FLUORESCENT TUBE

Title (en)

CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR ENERGY-SAVING OPERATION OF A FLUORESCENT TUBE

Title (de)

SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM ENERGIESPARENDEN BETREIBEN EINER LEUCHTSTOFFRÖHRE

Title (fr)

CONFIGURATION DE CIRCUIT DESTINEE AU FONCTIONNEMENT A FAIBLE CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE D'UN TUBE FLUORESCENT

Publication

EP 1095541 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99948909 A

Priority

  • DE 29817509 U
  • DE 19845131 A
  • DE 19853138 A
  • EP 9907256 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0021342A1] The invention relates to a circuit arrangement for energy-saving operation of a fluorescent tube (1) whereby two respective connections (2a, 2b; 3a, 3b) are arranged on the end caps (1a, 1b) of said tube. The fluorescent tube is mechanically and electrically linked to brackets (8, 9) via said connections (2a, 2b; 3a, 3b) and can be connected to an alternating current supply (6) via a reactance coil (4) and a starter (5). The objective of the invention is to allow the fluorescent tube to be retrofitted in a simple manner. This is achieved by means of a quadrupole (4) circuit arrangement, whereby the input terminals (7a, 7b) of said quadrupole form a series connection with the two connections (2a, 2b; 3a, 3b) on one end cap (1a, 1b) and the reactance coil (4), whereby said circuit is connected in parallel to the alternating current source (6), and the output terminals (7c, 7d) of said quadrupole are electrically connected to the two connections (3a, 3b,2a, 2b) on the other end cap (1b, 1a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/295

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/18 (2006.01); H05B 41/23 (2006.01); H05B 41/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/295 (2013.01); Y10S 315/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0021342A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0021342 A1 20000413; AT 220850 T 20020815; AU 6198699 A 20000426; AU 760871 B2 20030522; BR 9912901 A 20010508; CA 2338636 A1 20000413; CA 2338636 C 20040810; CN 1192689 C 20050309; CN 1313022 A 20010912; DK 1095541 T3 20021014; EP 1095541 A1 20010502; EP 1095541 B1 20020717; ES 2179679 T3 20030116; GB 0101932 D0 20010307; GB 2358972 A 20010808; HK 1040345 A1 20051007; HU 0103514 A2 20020228; HU 0103514 A3 20020328; HU 222698 B1 20030929; ID 29199 A 20010809; IL 141306 A 20040831; IL 141306 D0 20020310; JP 2002527867 A 20020827; JP 3999462 B2 20071031; MX PA01001499 A 20020507; NZ 509694 A 20021126; PL 189681 B1 20050930; PL 346052 A1 20020114; PT 1095541 E 20021231; TR 200100424 T2 20010521; US 6518715 B1 20030211

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180209

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-26 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020403331

- Effective date: 20150403

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220850 T

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-04-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20120630

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902054

2011-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110509

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-05-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-04-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-11-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH

- Free text: B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH#SAFFIGER STRASSE 14#56299 OCHTENDUNG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH#SAFFIGER STRASSE 14#56299 OCHTENDUNG (DE)

2009-10-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20090429

2009-06-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH; DE

- Effective date: 20090513

2009-05-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT (SCHWEIZ) MBH

2009-05-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH

- Free text: FUTURE NEW DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED#SCOTIA CENTRE, 4TH FLOOR P.O.BOX 2804#GEORGE TOWN, GRAND CAYMAN (KY) -TRANSFER TO- B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH#SAFFIGER STRASSE 14#56299 OCHTENDUNG (DE)

2009-05-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090423 AND 20090429

2009-04-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: B & S PATENTE UND MARKEN GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20090408

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179679 T3

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-12-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403331

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902054 20020822

2002-08-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010201;LT PAYMENT 20010201;LV PAYMENT 20010201;MK PAYMENT 20010201;RO PAYMENT 20010201;SI PAYMENT 20010201

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220850 T 20020815

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUTURE NEW DEVELOPMENTS LIMITED

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010201;LT PAYMENT 20010201;LV PAYMENT 20010201;MK PAYMENT 20010201;RO PAYMENT 20010201;SI PAYMENT 20010201