Global Patent Index - EP 1095577 A2

EP 1095577 A2 2001-05-02 - Visor for a helmet, especially for a motorcycle helmet

Title (en)

Visor for a helmet, especially for a motorcycle helmet

Title (de)

Visier für einen Helm, insbesondere einen Motorradhelm

Title (fr)

Visière pour casque, en particulier pour casque de motocyclistes

Publication

EP 1095577 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115547 A

Priority

  • DE 19952219 A
  • US 84263001 A

Abstract (en)

The visor for a helmet, and especially for a motor cycle rider, has an outer section (1) of injection molded plastics with edges (7) projecting inwards to take an inner section (2) in a positive fit. The inner section (2) is stamped from a plastics sheet, and is tensed in place within the outer section (1). The outer section (1) has a spherical curvature, and the inner section (2) is tinted and has an impact-resistant coating. A seal (14) is around the edge of the inner section (2) where it lies against the outer section (1).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Visier für einen Helm, insbesondere einen Motorradhelm, umfassend eine äußere Kunststoffscheibe und eine innere Kunststoffscheibe, welche unter Einschluß eines Luftpolsters über einen Dichtungsrand relativ zueinander auf Abstand gehalten sind, ist zur Erzielung einer einfachen Herstellbarkeit unter Vermeidung von Rahmenteilen vorgesehen, daß die äußere Scheibe (1) aus Kunststoff gespritzt ist und nach innen vorspringende Randbereiche (7) aufweist, in die eine aus flachem, plattenartigen Kunststoffmaterial gestanzte innere Scheibe (2) formschlüssig einsetzbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/22; A42B 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/22 (2006.01); A42B 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/226 (2013.01); A42B 3/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095577 A2 20010502; EP 1095577 A3 20011212; EP 1095577 B1 20040922; AT 276680 T 20041015; DE 19952219 A1 20010510; DE 19952219 C2 20030703; DE 50007865 D1 20041028; DK 1095577 T3 20050131; ES 2226671 T3 20050401; PT 1095577 E 20041231; US 6405373 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: PINLOCK PATENT B.V.

- Effective date: 20171011

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PINLOCK PATENT B.V., NL

- Effective date: 20160314

2016-03-11 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: , NL

- Effective date: 20160224

2016-03-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160211 AND 20160217

2016-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG, CH

2016-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PINLOCK PATENT B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UVEX SPORTS GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2016-01-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PINLOCK PATENT B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: UVEX SPORTS GMBH & CO. KG, 90766 FUERTH, DE

- Document: DE 50007865

2016-01-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007865

- Representative's name: HOYNG MONEGIER LLP, NL

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: UVEX SPORTS GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: UVEX SPORTS GMBH & CO. KG#FICHTENSTRASSE 43#90763 FUERTH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- UVEX SPORTS GMBH & CO. KG#WUERZBURGER STRASSE 154#90766 FUERTH (DE)

2009-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-10-14 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20090605

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DEREK'S PATENT B.V.

2005-08-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEREK'S PATENT B.V.

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-07-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226671 T3

2005-01-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403859

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007865 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-09-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-01-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: VISOR FOR A HELMET, ESPECIALLY FOR A MOTORCYCLE HELMET

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI