Global Patent Index - EP 1095579 A1

EP 1095579 A1 2001-05-02 - Ice skate boot

Title (en)

Ice skate boot

Title (de)

Stiefel für Schlittschuh

Title (fr)

Bottine de patin à glace

Publication

EP 1095579 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00810940 A

Priority

CH 198799 A

Abstract (en)

The skating boot with leather upper, includes internal reinforcement of resin-bonded synthetic fibers. The reinforcement, includes one or more layers (3) of a nonwoven textile containing fibers of high mechanical strength, bonded by a synthetic resin.

Abstract (fr)

Bottine de patin à glace à tige en cuir (1) munie d'un renfort intérieur comprenant au moins une couche (3) d'un matériau textile non tissé contenant des fibres à haute résistance mécanique, telles que des fibres aramides, liées par une résine synthétique. Cette bottine est particulièrement légère et peu sensible à l'humidité. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0486 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 5/0488 (2013.01); A43B 5/049 (2013.01); A43B 5/1683 (2013.01); A43B 5/1691 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095579 A1 20010502; EP 1095579 B1 20040721; CA 2324038 A1 20010429; CH 693585 A5 20031031; DE 60012284 D1 20040826; DE 60012284 T2 20050908

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091011

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2005-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012284 P 20040826

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI