Global Patent Index - EP 1095581 A2

EP 1095581 A2 2001-05-02 - Insole

Title (en)

Insole

Title (de)

Einlegesohle

Title (fr)

Semelle

Publication

EP 1095581 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119115 A

Priority

IT TO990195 U

Abstract (en)

An insole comprising an upper (2a) and a lower sheet (2b) of plastic material that are foot-sole shaped and joined along their perimeters in order to form a chamber (3) for containing a fluid (4), said insole (1) further comprising a longitudinal stiffening member (5) formed in a substantially central position in said chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 17/02; A43B 13/40; A43B 13/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/18 (2006.01); A43B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/189 (2013.01); A43B 17/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4567677 A 19860204 - ZONA JAMES [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095581 A2 20010502; EP 1095581 A3 20010801; IT TO990195 U1 20010427; IT TO990195 V0 19991027

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2002-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB LI

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB LI

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI