Global Patent Index - EP 1095585 A2

EP 1095585 A2 2001-05-02 - Envelope for chip cards

Title (en)

Envelope for chip cards

Title (de)

Kartenhülle für Chipkarten

Title (fr)

Enveloppe pour cartes à puce

Publication

EP 1095585 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118984 A

Priority

DE 19952122 A

Abstract (en)

Guide devices (16,17) inside a card pocket guide a chip card (1) to form a slot for taking the chip card and are so structured that they have no mechanical contact with integrated memory and/or evaluatory devices (2,3).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Kartenhülle (10) für Chipkarten, die Speichermittel und/oder Mittel zum Auswerten von auf der Chipkarte enthaltenen Informationen aufweisen, mit einem Kartenschacht zur Aufnahme einer Chipkarte, vorgeschlagen. Diese zeichnet sich erfindungsgemäß durch innerhalb des Kartenschachts (11) vorgesehene Mittel (16, 17) zur Führung einer Chipkarte (1), die einen Spalt (18) zur Aufnahme der Chipkarte (1) bilden, und eine Anordnung der Führungsmittel (16, 17) dergestalt, daß diese mechanisch mit den Speicher- und/oder Auswertemitteln (2, 3, 4) nicht in Kontakt treten, aus. Die erfindungsgemäße Kartenhülle ermöglicht die Aufbewahrung von Chipkarten, wobei die berührungs- oder verschmutzungsempfindlichen Speicher- und/oder Auswertemittel der Chipkarte, nämlich die Kontakte des Mikrochips, die Prägung und/oder der Magnetstreifen auf der Rückseite der Chipkarte sowohl während der Aufbewahrung der Chipkarte in der Kartenhülle, ebenso wie bei deren Einführen in oder Entnehmen aus der Hülle geschont werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 11/182 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095585 A2 20010502; EP 1095585 A3 20030827; DE 19952122 A1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45C 11/18 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 19/077 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI