Global Patent Index - EP 1095590 A2

EP 1095590 A2 2001-05-02 - Fixing device for removably attaching a strap to a binoculars

Title (en)

Fixing device for removably attaching a strap to a binoculars

Title (de)

Befestigungseinrichtung zur lösbaren Verbindung eines Halteriemens mit einem Fernglas

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixer de manière détachable une sangle à des jumelles

Publication

EP 1095590 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119245 A

Priority

DE 19949920 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting at binoculars, for a strap (7), has a clip (2) at the end of the strap with two V-shaped legs (3) which can be spread apart elastically, each with an inwards holding projection (8). A holder (12) is at the binoculars, with a shoulder (15) fitted with outward ratchet lock projections (16). The legs (3) are clicked on to the shoulder (15), to grip over the locking projections (16). A locking sleeve (9) has an inner free cross section with dimensions to pass over the legs (3) when they are in the locked position at the holder, and prevent them from spreading out.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Befestigungseinrichtung zur lösbaren Verbindung eines Endes eines Halteriemens mit einem Fernglas oder einem ähnlichen optischen Gerät ist zur Realisierung einer leichten Verbindung und Lösbarkeit bei sicherem Halt vorgesehen, daß an dem Ende des Riemens (7) eine Klammer (2) befestigt ist, welche zwei elastisch, V-förmig aufspreizbare Schenkel (3) aufweist, die jeweils an der Innenseite nach innen vorspringende Haltevorsprünge (8) aufweisen, wobei an dem Fernglas o. dgl. ein Halteteil (12) mit einem Ansatz (15, 19) vorgesehen ist, der sich seitlich nach außen erstreckende Rastvorsprünge (11, 16) aufweist, wobei die Schenkel (3) derart auf den Ansatz (15, 19) aufrastbar sind, daß deren Haltevorsprünge (8) die Rastvorsprünge (11, 16) des Ansatzes (15, 19) übergreifen, und wobei eine Arretierhülse (9) vorgesehen ist, deren freier Innenquerschnitt so dimensioniert ist, daß sie über die Schenkel (3) in deren aufgerasteten Zustand aufschiebbar ist und hierdurch ein Aufspreizen der Schenkel (3) verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 23/18 (2006.01); A45C 13/30 (2006.01); A45F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/30 (2013.01); A45F 5/00 (2013.01); Y10T 24/13 (2013.01); Y10T 24/1374 (2013.01); Y10T 24/44684 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45634 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4745 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095590 A2 20010502; EP 1095590 A3 20030820; DE 19949920 A1 20010628; JP 2001154116 A 20010608; JP 4248134 B2 20090402; US 6427292 B1 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-05-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45F 5/00 A

2003-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 44B 11/25 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI