Global Patent Index - EP 1095598 A1

EP 1095598 A1 2001-05-02 - Display counter with adjustable shelves

Title (en)

Display counter with adjustable shelves

Title (de)

Verkaufstheke mit verstellbaren Regalen

Title (fr)

Comptoir de vente comprenant des étagères réglables

Publication

EP 1095598 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00123514 A

Priority

IT UD990199 A

Abstract (en)

Display counter (10) equipped with a superstructure able to define an inner compartment (11), inside said compartment (11) there being provided at least a display shelf (21), said compartment (11) being defined between an upper plane (19) and a lower plane (18), said display shelf (21) being coupled in correspondence with two of its counter-opposed ends with respective bearing elements (23) by means of joints (24), each joint (24) having a first clamped position and a second unclamped position wherein it is able to move along said bearing element (23) to regulate the position in height of said shelf (21) inside said compartment (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/06; A47F 3/00; A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/04 (2006.01); A47F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/004 (2013.01); A47F 3/0439 (2013.01); A47F 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095598 A1 20010502; IT 1311558 B1 20020313; IT UD990199 A1 20010430; IT UD990199 D0 19991029

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040307

2002-01-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI