Global Patent Index - EP 1095601 A1

EP 1095601 A1 2001-05-02 - Meal support board

Title (en)

Meal support board

Title (de)

Trägerplatte für Mahlzeiten

Title (fr)

Plaquette de support à repas

Publication

EP 1095601 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830686 A

Priority

EP 99830686 A

Abstract (en)

A meal support board (1) for the consumption of meals at the table consists of a stiff shell (2) comprising a three-dimensionally shaped portion (3) having at least a recess (4) suitable for containing a dish (5). The recess (4) has shape surrounding the dish (5), for containing it firmly, shielding it from wind and preventing food from cooling, stiffening the dish owing to the stiff or semi-rigid structure of the meal support board (1). This way the temperature of food is maintained and the dish is prevented from flying away in case of meals outdoors. At the sides of the three-dimensionally shaped portion (3) substantially rectangular recesses (8) are provided that can be used for holding the cutlery, or a folded napkin, or bread-sticks. Further recesses (11 and 12) are provided for holding a piece of fruit, a portion of bread, a glass, etc.. The dish can have standard shape available on the market, or custom shape, suitable for a multiple use with the meal support board (1), which has square shape with curved edges and can be used both for a soup and for solid food. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095601 A1 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-02-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20011102

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20011102

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI