Global Patent Index - EP 1095608 A2

EP 1095608 A2 2001-05-02 - Bath screen

Title (en)

Bath screen

Title (de)

Duschabtrennung

Title (fr)

Ecran de douche

Publication

EP 1095608 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123056 A

Priority

GB 9925247 A

Abstract (en)

A bath screen comprising a plurality of panels (10, 11, 12) and means (13, 14) pivotally connecting the panels to one another for folding in zigzag fashion and deployment in alignment with one another, wherein said means pivotally connecting the panels is provided with detent means (27-30) operable for holding the panels in aligned deployment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/362 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095608 A2 20010502; EP 1095608 A3 20011017; EP 1095608 B1 20050316; DE 1095608 T1 20010823; DE 60018674 D1 20050421; DE 60018674 T2 20050804; GB 0025943 D0 20001213; GB 2356807 A 20010606; GB 2356807 B 20040331; GB 9925247 D0 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CORAM SHOWERS LTD

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081005

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60018674 P 20050421

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORAM SHOWERS LIMITED

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR NL

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020416

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-07-02 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-06-01 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI