Global Patent Index - EP 1095609 A2

EP 1095609 A2 2001-05-02 - Body care and/or massaging device

Title (en)

Body care and/or massaging device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Körperpflege und/oder massage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le soin et/ou le massage du corps

Publication

EP 1095609 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123274 A

Priority

DE 19952014 A

Abstract (en)

The body care and/or massage device (1) has a treatment head (7) which is driven by an electric motor, attached to a handle (2) with a handgrip (3) and a rechargable battery device (4) via a flexible, relatively rigid arm section (6). The treatment head is selectively fitted with a treatment element (8), e.g. a brush, which is locked in position relative to the treatment head.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Körperpflege und/oder -massage angegeben. Die Vorrichtung (1) hat einen motorisch betriebenen Behandlungskopf (7), welcher mit einer Griffeinrichtung (2), die gegebenenfalls einen Handgriff (3) und eine Batterieeinrichtung (4) mit einem zugeordneten Schalter (5) umfassen kann, über einen flexiblen, biegesteifen Armabschnitt (6) verbunden ist. Der Behandlungskopf (7) trägt auswechselbar ein zugeordnetes Behandlungselement (8). Dieses Behandlungselement (8) ist vorzugsweise in der vorbestimmten Arbeitsposition am Behandlungskopf (7) arretiert. Der Behandlungskopf (7) enthält zweckmäßigerweise einen Antriebsmotor (10) sowie gegebenenfalls ein zugeordnetes Getriebe, wie ein Planetengetriebe, und die Antriebswelle (13) des Antriebsmotors (10) ist mit dem jeweils am Behandlungskopf (7) vorgesehenen Behandlungselement (8) zum Drehantreiben desselben wirkverbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 7/04; A61H 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 7/04 (2006.01); A61H 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 7/04 (2013.01); A61H 7/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095609 A2 20010502; EP 1095609 A3 20020918; DE 19952014 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47K 7/04 A, 7A 61H 7/00 B, 7A 46B 13/02 B

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI