Global Patent Index - EP 1095647 A1

EP 1095647 A1 2001-05-02 - Bed with device for adjusting the height

Title (en)

Bed with device for adjusting the height

Title (de)

Bett mit Höhenverstelleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Lit avec dispositif de réglage de hauteur

Publication

EP 1095647 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121528 A

Priority

EP 99121528 A

Abstract (en)

The bed with a variable height setting has a carrier frame (4) for the variable positioning of the bed frame (1), with a number of tubes (11) for the supports (6) next to each other at the support frame (5). The bed frame supports (3) have a height adjustment within the guide tubes (11). A roller holder (7) is at the foot of each support (6), for the mounting of at least one roller (8) which slides on the axial direction of the support (6).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Bett, bestehend aus einem einen Bettrahmen (2) und mehrere Bettrahmenstützen (3) aufweisenden Bettgestell (1), einem das Bettgestell (1) tragenden und einen Tragrahmen (5) sowie mehrere Tragstützen (6) aufweisenden Traggestell (4) und einer Höhenverstelleinrichtung zum Heben und Senken des Bettgestells (1) gegenüber dem Traggestell (4). Um ein Bett bereitzustellen, das eine hohe Standsicherheit bietet und bei gleichzeitig guter Zugänglichkeit zu Reinigungszwecken wenig anfällig für Verschmutzungen ist, wird mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen, daß das Traggestell (4) für eine höhenverstellbare Anordnung des Bettgestells (1) mehrere den Tragstützen (6) nebengeordnet am Tragrahmen (5) angeordnete Führungsrohre (11) aufweist, wobei die Bettrahmenstützen (3) innerhalb der Führungsrohre (11) höhenverstellbar angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/012; A47C 19/00; A47C 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/02 (2006.01); A47C 19/04 (2006.01); A61G 7/012 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/045 (2013.01); A47C 19/024 (2013.01); A61G 7/012 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095647 A1 20010502; DE 29924743 U1 20050519

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050218

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB NL

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI