Global Patent Index - EP 1095683 A2

EP 1095683 A2 2001-05-02 - Magnetic composition toy

Title (en)

Magnetic composition toy

Title (de)

Magnetisches Zusammenstellungsspielzeug

Title (fr)

Jouet de composition magnétique

Publication

EP 1095683 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500223 A

Priority

ES 9902740 U

Abstract (en)

Composition toy comprising a main template (1) representing certain figures and a number of secondary templates (5,6) which represent complements which may be applied to main template (1), with the union between templates (1,5,6) performed by magnetically attracting particles (4,8) concealed in the main template (1) and in secondary templates (5,6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 3/52; A63H 33/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/52 (2006.01); A63H 33/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 3/52 (2013.01); A63H 33/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095683 A2 20010502; EP 1095683 A3 20030910; ES 1044850 U 20000616; ES 1044850 Y 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI