Global Patent Index - EP 1095692 A1

EP 1095692 A1 2001-05-02 - Process and installation for purification of exhaust gases from internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Process and installation for purification of exhaust gases from internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur Reinigung von Abgasen einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation d'épuration des gaz d'échappement de moteurs thermiques

Publication

EP 1095692 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402992 A

Priority

FR 9913630 A

Abstract (en)

The process enables the removal of gaseous contaminants from the exhaust gases of thermal engines, particularly diesel locomotives operating in confined spaces. The process comprises the following stages: re-heating of the exhaust gases to a temperature of 300 - 450 degrees C., preferably 350 - 360 degrees C.; treatment of the oxides of carbon and hydrocarbons by catalytic oxidation; addition of a reactant such as urea or ammonia; treatment of oxides of nitrogen by catalytic reduction; cooling of the gaseous flow; treatment of the sulfur oxides by mixing with water in a venturi-effect washer; and bubbling of the residual gases through water. The addition of a reactant is regulated as a function of the nitrogen oxide content in the exhaust gases. An Independent claim is also included for the installation for the process.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé d'épuration des gaz d'échappement de moteurs thermiques comporte les étapes ci-après exécutées en séquence : réchauffage des gaz d'échappement jusqu'à une température comprise entre 300°C et 450°C; traitement des oxydes de carbone et des hydrocarbures par oxydation catalytique; adjonction d'un réactif; traitement des oxydes d'azote par réduction catalytique; refroidissement du flux gazeux; traitement des oxydes de souffre par mélange du flux gazeux avec de l'eau dans un laveur; barbotage du flux gazeux dans l'eau. L'adjonction de réactif est régulée en fonction de la teneur en oxyde d'azote des gaz d'échappement produits par le moteur. La régulation s'effectue au moyen d'un signal de sortie obtenu par comparaison du régime instantané du moteur avec la courbe théorique des émissions d'oxyde d'azote du moteur en fonction de sa vitesse de rotation pour délivrer un signal de sortie sur un régulateur d'injection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/75; B01D 47/02; B01D 53/14; B01D 53/60; B01D 53/62; B01D 53/72; B01D 53/86; B01D 53/90; B01D 53/92; B01D 53/94; B61C 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 47/02 (2006.01); B01D 53/14 (2006.01); B01D 53/86 (2006.01); B01D 53/90 (2006.01); B01D 53/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/9459 (2013.01); B01D 47/021 (2013.01); B01D 53/1481 (2013.01); B01D 53/869 (2013.01); B01D 53/90 (2013.01); B01D 53/9418 (2013.01); B01D 53/944 (2013.01); B01D 53/9477 (2013.01); B01D 2251/2062 (2013.01); B01D 2251/2067 (2013.01); B01D 2255/20723 (2013.01); Y02A 50/2325 (2018.01); Y02T 10/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095692 A1 20010502; EP 1095692 B1 20070110; DE 60032850 D1 20070222; DE 60032850 T2 20071025; FR 2800298 A1 20010504; FR 2800298 B1 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2008-05-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-08-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-06-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE SA

2007-04-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070421

2007-04-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032850 P 20070222

2007-02-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070110

2007-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TSO

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TSO

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEVERIN ETUDES CONSTRUCTION MAINTENANCE SECM

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI