Global Patent Index - EP 1095710 A2

EP 1095710 A2 2001-05-02 - Procedure and plant to obtain drawings on surfaces

Title (en)

Procedure and plant to obtain drawings on surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zum Erzeugen von Zeichen auf einer Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour obtenir des dessins sur une surface

Publication

EP 1095710 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203691 A

Priority

IT MI992238 A

Abstract (en)

A procedure to obtain a drawing on a surface of a element (7) comprises the steps of fixing a coat paint, that is also a good electrical isolator, (such as powder or liquid varnish), on the surface; deposing or extracting electrical. charges on or from the surface in points reproducing the drawing; treating the surface with at least a electrostatic paint having an electrical charge opposed or equal to the charges deposed on the surface, depending on negative or positive drawing is to be transferred, in order to make the drawing visible; fixing the drawing so obtained by final polymerization of the paint. A plant (25) comprises a coating section (26) for fixing the coat paint, a second section (27) for deposing electrical charges on or extracting electrical, a electrostatic painting section (28) for treating the surface with at least a electrostatic paint.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/04 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B44C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/045 (2013.01); B05D 1/007 (2013.01); B05D 5/061 (2013.01); B44C 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095710 A2 20010502; EP 1095710 A3 20031210; IT 1313824 B1 20020923; IT MI992238 A1 20010427; IT MI992238 D0 19991027

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040612

2004-10-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-09-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 5/06 A

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/06 B

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 44C 1/00 B

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/00 B

2003-12-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/04 B

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHECCUCCI, PAOLO

2001-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHECCUCCI, PAOLO

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI