Global Patent Index - EP 1095717 A2

EP 1095717 A2 2001-05-02 - Method and device for hydromechanical deep drawing of metal sheet

Title (en)

Method and device for hydromechanical deep drawing of metal sheet

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum hydromechanischen Tiefziehen von Metallblech

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l' emboutissage profond hydromécanique de tôles

Publication

EP 1095717 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122059 A

Priority

DE 19952105 A

Abstract (en)

For a hydromechanical deep drawing shaping action, on a metal sheet, a gas under pressure is applied to the sheet in the shaping direction to give an initial shaping action. A tool with the required contour gives the metal sheet the final shaping. The gas is fed in under pressure, from a gas supply connection (9), into the space (11) between the upper die (5) and the clamped metal sheet (10).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum hydromechanischen Tiefziehen von Metallblech (10) beschrieben, bei dem das Blech (10) in der Trennebene zwischen einem Oberwerkzeug (5) und einem Unterwerkzeug (2), von denen eines die Formkontur aufweist, flüssigkeitsdicht eingespannt, mittels Druckgas in Umformrichtung beaufschlagt und vorgeformt und anschließend in gleicher Richtung mittels des die Formkontur aufweisenden Werkzeugs gegen ein hydraulisches Kissen in dem anderen Werkzeug endgeformt wird. Ferner ist eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095717 A2 20010502; EP 1095717 A3 20020102; DE 19952105 A1 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT SE

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI