Global Patent Index - EP 1095737 A3

EP 1095737 A3 2003-06-04 - Holding disc for flap grinding wheel

Title (en)

Holding disc for flap grinding wheel

Title (de)

Trägerteller für Lamellenschleifscheiben

Title (fr)

Disque support pour meule à lamelles

Publication

EP 1095737 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106457 A

Priority

DE 29914325 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1095737A2] The rear side of the flange (7) has two concentric ring supporting surfaces (8,9) on the inside and outside rims of the flange rear side. The surfaces project beyond the flange rear to serve as mounting for the disk (6) placed on the nearest lamellar grinding wheel (2). The inner ring surface (8) is formed by a rising transition area from the flange rear face to the wheel boss (3) as against the outer (9) which consists of a bead or shoulder on the outside rim of the flange rear. The transition area can form a hollow throat or a smooth ramp and the rear face of the flange should be capable of taking print (17) between the ring surfaces (8,9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 9/08; B24D 13/16; B24D 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 9/08 (2006.01); B24D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 9/08 (2013.01); B24D 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914325 U1 20000127; AT 283148 T 20041215; DE 20005548 U1 20000914; EP 1095737 A2 20010502; EP 1095737 A3 20030604; EP 1095737 B1 20041124; ES 2157865 T1 20010901; ES 2157865 T3 20050516

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080324

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080325

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080325

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080324

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157865 T3

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008733 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 9/08 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 13/16 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 24D 18/00 B

2001-09-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157865 T1

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI