Global Patent Index - EP 1095740 A1

EP 1095740 A1 2001-05-02 - Staple gun wire guide

Title (en)

Staple gun wire guide

Title (de)

Drahtführung für Heftpistole

Title (fr)

Guide-fil pour pistolet agrafeur

Publication

EP 1095740 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303378 A

Priority

EP 00303378 A

Abstract (en)

A device to improve attaching wires to a substrate with a staple gun is disclosed. An elongated nose piece (30) extends down from the front of the tool body and locks in position to hold the tool bottom a preset distance away from the substrate. The nose piece includes a recess (32) to provide clearance for the wire as the nose piece is pressed against the substrate. The wire guide (30) improves the operation of stapling wires by preventing the staple from crushing the wire and by aligning the tool over the wire so that the staple points are inserted a safe distance to each side of the wire. The present invention is an improvement over the prior art staple gun wire guides since it is a permanent part of the tool. It is slidably fixed to a vertical track (13) at the front end of the tool. It does not increase the bulk of the tool front end and cannot be misplaced. In one embodiment the wire guide is internal to the tool in sliding contact with the plunger (18). In a further embodiment the wire guide is exposed along the front exterior of the tool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 5/06 (2006.01); B25C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 5/06 (2013.01); B25C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095740 A1 20010502; EP 1095740 B1 20061115; DE 60031822 D1 20061228; DE 60031822 T2 20070913

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031822 P 20061228

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI