Global Patent Index - EP 1095745 A2

EP 1095745 A2 2001-05-02 - Method for preparing a system composed of shaping tools, an adjustment rig for carrying out the method and a system of elements for preparing the upper part of a stripping tool

Title (en)

Method for preparing a system composed of shaping tools, an adjustment rig for carrying out the method and a system of elements for preparing the upper part of a stripping tool

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vorbereitung von formgebenden Werkzeugen, Einstelltisch zur Ausführung des Verfahrens und Teilesatz zur Vorbereitung eines oberen Ausbrechwerkzeuges

Title (fr)

Procédé pour préparer un système d outils de faconnage, table de réglage pour mettre en oeuvre ce procédé et esemble d éléments pour préparer une forme supérieure d éjection

Publication

EP 1095745 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00122677 A

Priority

CH 194999 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure consists of the following stages: locating the central ejection panel (5) and ejector carrier plate (4) face to face outside the shaping press and fixing them in a regulating position; fixing the ejectors to the plate to the right of the central ejection ports to form the upper ejection form; and the upper form and central panel are fitted and centred in the ejection station of the press. In the regulating position the ejector plate and central panel are in the same relative positions as those they will occupy in the ejection station after assembly.

Abstract (fr)

Une table de réglage pour préparer un système d'outils de façonnage d'une station d'éjection d'une presse de façonnage met face à face, dans une position simulant le centrage selon l'axe machine et le positionnement au premier filet, la plaque porte-éjecteurs (4) d'une forme supérieure d'éjection, une planche centrale d'éjection (5) et une réplique d'un cadre-tiroir porte aiguilles télescopiques. La préparation de la forme supérieure d'éjection est effectuée en se servant de la planche centrale d'éjection (5) comme gabarit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 2007/189 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49895 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49897 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49899 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49902 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53961 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095745 A2 20010502; EP 1095745 A3 20050427; AU 6660000 A 20010503; AU 778195 B2 20041118; CA 2324181 A1 20010426; CA 2324181 C 20040810; CH 693787 A5 20040213; CN 1201905 C 20050518; CN 1304824 A 20010725; JP 2001121486 A 20010508; KR 100472116 B1 20050307; KR 20010060175 A 20010706; TW 504440 B 20021001; US 2002124372 A1 20020912; US 6598284 B1 20030729; US 6691395 B2 20040217

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110104

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060904

2006-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI