Global Patent Index - EP 1095756 A3

EP 1095756 A3 2001-05-16 - Injection stretch blow molding apparatus

Title (en)

Injection stretch blow molding apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spritzstreckblasfromen

Title (fr)

Appareil de moulage par injection-etirage-soufflage

Publication

EP 1095756 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01100386 A

Priority

  • EP 97117279 A
  • JP 28740396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0835736A2] An stretch blow molding apparatus having a heating section (42) and a blow molding section (44), which are disposed along a carrying path used to carry preforms (28) each having a handle (80) in an intermittent manner. The preforms (28) are rotated around their axes through a chain (110) and sprockets (102) when they are carried in the heating section. A stand-by section (50) is located between the heating section (42) and the blow molding section (44). The stand-by section (50) includes guide plates (116, 118) which function as arrangement means for arranging the handles extending from the respective preforms (28) in a given direction. Thus, all the handles (80) can be oriented in a direction in which the preforms (28) are carried. This can also prevent the handles (80) from being caught in a blow cavity mold (48). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 49/42; B29C 45/04; B29C 49/06; B29C 49/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/04 (2006.01); B29C 49/06 (2006.01); B29C 49/20 (2006.01); B29C 49/42 (2006.01); B29C 49/64 (2006.01); B29C 33/04 (2006.01); B29C 35/08 (2006.01); B29C 35/16 (2006.01); B29C 49/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 49/6463 (2013.01); B29C 45/062 (2013.01); B29C 49/06 (2013.01); B29C 49/062 (2013.01); B29C 49/4205 (2013.01); B29C 49/6409 (2013.01); B29C 49/6445 (2013.01); B29B 2911/14506 (2013.01); B29B 2911/14906 (2013.01); B29C 33/04 (2013.01); B29C 49/12 (2013.01); B29C 2035/0822 (2013.01); B29C 2035/1616 (2013.01); B29K 2105/253 (2013.01); B29L 2031/463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0835736 A2 19980415; EP 0835736 A3 19990714; EP 0835736 B1 20020306; DE 69710840 D1 20020411; DE 69710840 T2 20021107; DE 69712929 D1 20020704; DE 69712929 T2 20030102; DE 69713172 D1 20020711; DE 69713172 T2 20021128; EP 1095756 A2 20010502; EP 1095756 A3 20010516; EP 1095756 B1 20020605; EP 1095757 A2 20010502; EP 1095757 A3 20010523; EP 1095757 B1 20020529; ES 2172725 T3 20021001; ES 2177515 T3 20021216; ES 2177516 T3 20021216; JP 3722572 B2 20051130; JP H10113978 A 19980506; PT 1095756 E 20021031; PT 1095757 E 20021129; PT 835736 E 20020731

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171007

2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171013

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171005

2017-10-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171005

2017-10-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69713172

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161005

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177516 T3

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020402776

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69713172 20020711

2002-06-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 835736

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-05-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 835736

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT