Global Patent Index - EP 1095776 A1

EP 1095776 A1 2001-05-02 - Improved ultrasonic cleaning system in ink jet printing systems

Title (en)

Improved ultrasonic cleaning system in ink jet printing systems

Title (de)

Verbessertes Ultraschallreinigungssystem für Tintenstrahldrucksysteme

Title (fr)

Système de nettoyage à ultrason amélioré dans un système d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1095776 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00309006 A

Priority

US 43072199 A

Abstract (en)

The efficiency of ultrasonic cleaning of a printhead is improved by sweeping the stimulation drive frequency. The cleaning frequency is swept at a constant drive amplitude. The drive amplitude, lower frequency limit, and upper frequency limit are stored in the printhead memory. When the printhead is in an ultrasonic cleaning state, as determined by the state table, the print station varies the frequency at a fixed rate. The drive amplitude is kept constant during the ultrasonic cleaning state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/17; B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/165 (2006.01); B41J 2/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16552 (2013.01); B41J 2/1714 (2013.01); B41J 2/185 (2013.01); B41J 2002/16567 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095776 A1 20010502; EP 1095776 B1 20061004; CA 2323820 A1 20010429; DE 60031065 D1 20061116; DE 60031065 T2 20070516; JP 2001158109 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60031065

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121013

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121013

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031065 P 20061116

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-04-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMPROVED ULTRASONIC CLEANING SYSTEM IN INK JET PRINTING SYSTEMS

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI