Global Patent Index - EP 1095779 A2

EP 1095779 A2 2001-05-02 - Method and apparatus for refilling an ink container

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for refilling an ink container

Title (de)

Nachfüllverfahren und -vorrichtung für Farbstoffbehälter

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de recharge pour recipient d'encre

Publication

EP 1095779 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309474 A

Priority

  • US 43040099 A
  • US 62795800 A

Abstract (en)

The present disclosure relates to an apparatus 54 for refilling a replaceable ink container 12. The ink container 12 has a top and bottom portion relative to a gravitational frame of reference. The replaceable ink container 12 further has a capillary storage member 40 disposed therein and a fluid outlet 36 disposed on the bottom portion. The apparatus for refilling includes a fluid interconnect 78 configured for insertion into the bottom portion to compress the capillary storage member 40. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17509 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4771295 A 19880913 - BAKER JEFFREY P [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095779 A2 20010502; EP 1095779 A3 20010613; EP 1095779 B1 20060412; DE 60027250 D1 20060524; DE 60027250 T2 20070118; JP 2001130024 A 20010515; JP 3434497 B2 20030811

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081027

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027250 P 20060524

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040226

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI