Global Patent Index - EP 1095781 A1

EP 1095781 A1 2001-05-02 - Ink-jet cartridge

Title (en)

Ink-jet cartridge

Title (de)

Tintenstrahlpatrone

Title (fr)

Cartouche à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1095781 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99250375 A

Priority

EP 99250375 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is about an ink-jet cartridge (1) for thermal bubble ink-jet printers, which comprises: a housing (11), for containing the necessary printing ink (13) for the printer; a printhead (14), having a plurality of opening orifices, through which ink may stream forth unto paper upon demand; and a pressure-adjustment means (12), having a hollow tube for receiving ink therewithin, and one end of which having a ventilation opening for contact with the atmosphere and the other end thereof having at least one opening for contact with the ink, wherein said ventilation opening of the pressure-adjustment means being fixed onto the housing of the ink-jet cartridge and said opening being positioned at the bottom portion of the ink-jet cartridge on the same said as the printhead. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17556 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095781 A1 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051018

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040713

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI