Global Patent Index - EP 1095860 A1

EP 1095860 A1 2001-05-02 - Method for handling standing pouches

Title (en)

Method for handling standing pouches

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Handhaben von Standbeuteln

Title (fr)

Procédé pour manipuler des sachets tenants debout

Publication

EP 1095860 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00122888 A

Priority

DE 19952006 A

Abstract (en)

To handle and manipulate cartons (2) of beverages which stand on their base, after they have been filled and sealed and cooled, they are transferred while prone before the drinking straw (3) is fitted. The are shifted on a line at right angles to their longitudinal axes into a station (9) where the drinking straws (3) are fitted, and their bases (2a) are on the same side. They are moved onwards to the packaging station (4), with their bases aligned outwards from the center of the pack. The carton filling and sealing, the transfer into the prone transport position, the fitting of the drinking straws (3) and the movement into the packing station (4) are all within a continuous prodn. line (1).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Handhaben von Standboden-Beuteln (2) für Getränke beschrieben, wobei die Beutel (2) gefüllt, verschlossen, mit einem Trinkhalm (3) versehen und zu mehreren in eine Umverpackung (4) eingebracht, ausgegeben werden. Um dieses Verfahren schneller und somit wirtschaftlicher zu machen, wird vorgeschlagen, die Standboden-Beutel (2) zwischen dem Verschließen und dem Einbringen in die Umverpackung (4) liegend zu transportieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 35/24; B65B 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/56 (2006.01); B65B 5/10 (2006.01); B65B 35/24 (2006.01); B65B 61/20 (2006.01); B65D 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/24 (2013.01); B65B 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095860 A1 20010502; EP 1095860 B1 20050504; AT 294738 T 20050515; CN 1198745 C 20050427; CN 1296904 A 20010530; DE 19952006 A1 20010510; DE 50010214 D1 20050609; DK 1095860 T3 20050606; ES 2239989 T3 20051016; HK 1037585 A1 20051021; ID 28126 A 20010503; JP 2001171614 A 20010626; JP 3642275 B2 20050427; KR 100381060 B1 20030418; KR 20010040215 A 20010515; MX PA00010529 A 20020424; PT 1095860 E 20050729; SA 1592 B1 20061125; TW 513369 B 20021211; US 6681547 B1 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171030

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-03-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239989 T3

2005-08-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-07-12 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401790

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010214 P 20050609

2005-06-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI