Global Patent Index - EP 1095862 A1

EP 1095862 A1 2001-05-02 - APPARATUS FOR APPLYING DRINKING STRAWS TO BEVERAGE POUCHES

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR APPLYING DRINKING STRAWS TO BEVERAGE POUCHES

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anbringen von Trinkhalmen an Getränkebeuteln

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR APPLIQUER DES PAILLES A DES SACHETS POUR BOISSONS

Publication

EP 1095862 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00122890 A

Priority

DE 19952008 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. to mount drinking straws at beverage cartons (3), with standing bases, has a drinking straw transfer unit which is pitched at an acute angle ( alpha ) to the carton conveyor path (4a), which matches the angle of the carton surface (3a) on the conveyor path (4a) to carry the drinking straw (2). The straw transfer unit has a rotating transfer drum (6) on a center axis (6a) pitched at the transfer angle ( alpha ), with the drinking straws (2) around its circumference.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zum Anbringen eines Trinkhalms (2) an einer Aufnahmefläche (3a) eines Standboden-Beutels (3) beschrieben, der auf einer Förderfläche einer Übergabeeinrichtung (5) für Trinkhalme (2) zuführbar ist. Um die Fördergeschwindigkeit dieser Vorrichtung zu erhöhen, wird vorgeschlagen, die Übergabeeinrichtung (5) so anzuordnen, dass der Trinkhalm (2) beim Übergeben mit der Förderfläche (4a) einen spitzen Winkel (α) einschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/22 (2006.01); B65B 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/205 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1095862 A1 20010502; EP 1095862 B1 20060315; AT 320379 T 20060415; CN 1191968 C 20050309; CN 1294078 A 20010509; DE 19952008 A1 20010510; DE 50012399 D1 20060511; DK 1095862 T3 20060606; ES 2258435 T3 20060901; HK 1036784 A1 20050923; ID 27949 A 20010503; JP 2001171625 A 20010626; JP 3906023 B2 20070418; KR 100432806 B1 20040522; KR 20010077906 A 20010820; MX PA00010527 A 20020424; PT 1095862 E 20060630; TW 491265 U 20020611; US 2011036053 A1 20110217; US 7946098 B1 20110524; US 8250834 B2 20120828

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171030

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-11-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258435 T3

2006-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060419

2006-06-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-05-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060401132

2006-05-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012399 P 20060511

2006-04-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. HORST QUEHL PATENTANWALT

2006-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060315

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI